THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:36:45 AM
Errett, Lee Edward
CPSO#:
31108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
149 College Street
Toronto ON M4W 3W5
Phone: 416-978-1662
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 18, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 3, 2014, St. Michael's Hospital notified the College that Dr. Lee Edward Errett's privileges with respect to aortic valve procedures were voluntarily restricted, effective November 18, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEE EDWARD ERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRETT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 06 Dec 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1994 |