skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 9:57:18 AM

Hajek, Vlasta Eva

CPSO#: 31101

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Masaryk University of Brno, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 32 De Vere Gardens Toronto ON M5M 3E7
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018