skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/12/21 20:39:28 PM

Sax, Solly Erwin

CPSO#: 31071

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr Sol E Sax Medicine Professional
Suite 402
4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2T1
Phone: (416) 234-2060
Fax: (416) 850-5687 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1919 Minnesota Crt
Mississauga ON  L5N 0C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 858-6299
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

7333 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON  L5N 6L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 819-7203
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sol E. Sax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sax ( CPSO# 31071 )

Business Address:
600-3700 Steeles Ave W
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8K8

Business Address:
402-4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2T1

Business Address:
1333 Tonolli Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 279-9555

Business Address:
7333 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 6L4
Phone Number: (905) 819-7203

Business Address:
1919 Minnesota Court
Mississauga ON  L5N 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 858-6299

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective:19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOLLY ERWIN SAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1979