THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:04:27 AM
McGurk, Francis Myrle
CPSO#:
31042
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Oct 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jun 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2005 |