THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:12:08 AM
Payton, Keith Bramwell
CPSO#:
31017
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Keith Payton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:After June 30, 2018 medical records for Dr. Payton will be stored at:
Access Corporation Canada
100 Piccadilly St, London, ON N6A 1R8
Phone 1-877-663-7708
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:03 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2019 |