THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:54:52 AM
Whately, Christopher George
CPSO#:
30945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
26 Dufferin Ave
Brantford ON N3T 4P3
Phone: 519 771 0649
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Christopher Whately Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE WHATELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHATELY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2010 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 30, 2012, at the Dubai Court in United Arab Emirates, a finding of medical negligence and malpractice was made against Dr. Whately in respect of an incident that took place in April of 2009.