THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:54:29 AM
Meghji, Murtaza Mohamedali
CPSO#:
30907
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Paitents looking who are looking to obtain a copy of their record should contact Dr.Merali by letter at the Belmont Professional Centre:
309 - 564 Belmont Ave
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Date Received: 20 Jul 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may call or send a written request to the above address to the attention of Dr. M. Abbas.
Belmont Professional Centre
309 - 564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Telephone Number (519) 744-1167
Fax Number (519) 744-1168
Date Received: 25 May 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may call or send a written request to the above address to the attention of Dr. A. Merali.
Belmont Professional Centre
309 - 564 Belmont Ave
Kitchener, ON N2M 5N6
Tel: 519-744-1167
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |