THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:42:43 AM
Pratt, Lynn
CPSO#:
30878
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Pratt, Susan Lynn (used until: 08 Feb 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lynn Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Fort William Clinic
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay, ON P7B 0A1
Date Received: 12 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2017 |