skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 10:11:18 AM

Chu, Joseph Yiu-Cho

CPSO#: 30854

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Professional Centre
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 312
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-0740
Fax: (416) 626-0635 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Y. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chu ( CPSO# 30854 )

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
312 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 626-0740


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH YIU-CHO CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979