THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:18:43 PM
Hendrick, Arthur Corbin
CPSO#:
30840
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Corbin Hendrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3Y 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 16 Feb 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Arthur Corbin Hendrick to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hendrick engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his family practice, in particular with regards to his opioid prescribing. During the investigation, Dr. Hendrick resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)