THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:46:48 AM
Pressnail, Bryn Lloyd
CPSO#:
30836
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
18 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice
as of
19 Jan 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bryn Pressnail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:5 Bay St
Oro-Medonte, Ontario
L0L 2L0
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jan 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Feb 2022 |