THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:33:05 AM
Lehman, Robert Malcolm
CPSO#:
30827
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1993 |