THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:30:10 PM
Dean, Carolyn Flora Anne
CPSO#:
30780
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
24 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1979 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 24 Jul 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jul 1995
Summary:
In July 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Dean guilty of professional misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. It further found Dr. Dean incompetent, in that she displayed in her professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates she is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered on July 24, 1995 that Dr. Dean's licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 24, 1995