THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:30:11 AM
Jacques, Ian Ross
CPSO#:
30754
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay, ON P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 1977 to 17 Oct 1978
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |