skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 5:27:53 AM

Horsham, Patricia Angela Mona

CPSO#: 30643

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SUNRISE MEDICAL CENTRE
1460 MERIVALE ROAD
Ottawa ON  K2E 5P2
Phone: 613 727 7473
Fax: 613 727 2754 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Canada
Phone: (613) 526-2850
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANGELA MONA HORSHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORSHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013