THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:46:31 AM
Hunter, Joseph Barry
CPSO#:
30633
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Apr 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.B. Hunter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:365 Rosslyn Dr.
Burlington ON L7N 1S5
Date Received: 06 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:24 Mar 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2019 |