skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 19:11:23 PM

Bokhout, Maarten

CPSO#: 30629

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maarten Bokhout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

105 Shipley Street, Clinton, Ontario, Canada (Clinton Family Health Team)
Mailing Address:  Box 69, Clinton, Ontario N0M 1L0
Date Received: 19 Apr 2022


Instructions/Address:

105 Shipley Street, Clinton, Ontario, Canada (Clinton Family Health Team)

Mailing Address:  Box 69, Clinton, Ontario N0M 1L0
Date Received: 19 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2022