THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:53:23 AM
Oreopoulos, Dimitrios George
CPSO#:
30581
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jan 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Apr-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2011 |