skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 0:04:09 AM

Scholz, John Frederick

CPSO#: 30565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John F. Scholz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Scholz ( CPSO# 30565 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: Bluewater Health, 89 Norman Street, Sarnia, ON, N7T 6S3, Tel: 519-464-4500
Date Received: 07 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK SCHOLZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOLZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1979