THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 21:04:53 PM
Gorman, Howard Edwin
CPSO#:
30500
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
315 Avenue Road
Suite 9
Toronto ON M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 651-1414
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Howard E. Gorman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOWARD EDWIN GORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1978 |