THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:00:01 AM
Howard, John Mitchell
CPSO#:
30476
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
30 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Nov 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Electronic Medical Records
Middlesex Centre
Family Medical Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2017 |