THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 23:27:42 PM
Shukla, Avanish Kumar
CPSO#:
30442
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Oct 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Lucknow, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. K. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y8
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
www.GetMyRecord.ca
Date Received: 11 Nov 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2016 |