THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:45:33 AM
Wright, Martha Elizabeth
CPSO#:
30388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1508
77 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON M4T 1M5
Phone: (416) 960-8775
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Martha Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTHA ELIZABETH WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2023 |