skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 7:23:33 AM

Mullan, Michael John

CPSO#: 30366

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Aug 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Aug 2021 Active
 
(1 of 2)

As from August 24, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Johjn Mullan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mullan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

("Undertaking") 

of

DR. MICHAEL JOHN MULLAN

("Dr. Mullan") to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public; "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.

(2)	I, Dr. Mullan, certificate of registration number 30366, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(3)	I, Dr. Mullan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(4)	I, Dr. Mullan, undertake that I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a)	I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;

(b)	I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of continuing professional development that meets the requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for continuing professional development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and

(c)	The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.

(5)	I, Dr. Mullan, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(6)	I, Dr. Mullan, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Closing a Medical Practice. I also undertake to abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(7)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practise, the College may, among other things:

(a)	request that I agree to specified terms, conditions or limitations being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b)	request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(9)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following: consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(12)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
 
(13)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mullan's knowledge, skill and judgment. Dr. Mullan has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

D.	CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Mullan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Mullan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.


(2 of 2)

As from June 4, 2010, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael John Mullan,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mullan to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Mullan has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges with
respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in
the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and
summarized as follows:
                  
                  
Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

Controlled Drugs
(from Schedule G of the Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                  X

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
Targeted Substances Regulations made 
under the Controlled Drugs and 
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X





Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael John Mullan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 24, 2021:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mullan’s knowledge, skill and judgment. Dr. Mullan has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

 

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)