THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:00:22 AM
Hodsman, Anthony Bryan
CPSO#:
30324
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. B. Hodsman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Health Records
St Josephs Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London, ON N6A 4V2
Tel: 519 646 6100 x65585
Fax: 519 646 6028
Date Received: 07 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2014 |