skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 4:22:06 AM

Nordin, Christopher Eric

CPSO#: 30322

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 24 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Jun 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Eric Nordin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nordin’s prescribing practice. As a result of the investigation Dr. Nordin underwent remediation followed by a reassessment. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Nordin’s standard of practice in prescribing. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Nordin will not take on any new patients requiring Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs.

Dr. Nordin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for three (3) months.

Dr. Nordin will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and record keeping.

Dr. Nordin’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: May 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Eric Nordin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 21, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nordin engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent his general practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Nordin must not practise any of the following: psychotherapy, and counselling.

Dr. Nordin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Nordin will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.

Dr. Nordin’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Dr. Nordin shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Nordin must not practise any of the following: psychotherapy, and counselling. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
Download Full Document (PDF)