THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:55:38 PM
Perera, Clara Philomena
CPSO#:
30316
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-May-2014
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ceylon, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2006 |