skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 2:08:40 AM

Kay, John Michael

CPSO#: 30281

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Birmingham, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton, ON  L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 22 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014