THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:02:43 AM
Yunker, Peter Joseph
CPSO#:
30261
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter J. Yunker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:242 Allan St
Smith Falls ON K7A 5E9
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2019 |