THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:45:43 AM
Babay, Hichem
CPSO#:
30248
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Italian
Education: University of Tours, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hichem Babay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:19 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jan 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 25, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Babay was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. While these allegations were outstanding, Dr. Babay resigned from the College effective January 25, 2012, and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.