skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 9:02:02 AM

De Mercado, Robert Bruce

CPSO#: 30170

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jan 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 May 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Oct 1980
Summary:

 In October 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. De Mercado guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with 
 a patient, contrary to s. 26(28); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  The Committee 
 further found Dr. De Mercado guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant 
 to his suitability to practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. De Mercado(s licence 
 to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 27 Apr 1981
Hearing Date(s): Oct 20, 1980

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 17 Jan 1985
Decision: Application Accepted