THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:05:09 AM
Bishop, Clare Elizabeth
CPSO#:
30144
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vaughan, Clare Elizabeth (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jean Pierre Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2022 |