THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:36:02 AM
DeYoung, John Paul
CPSO#:
30137
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 938-2332
Fax: (613) 938-3172
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:04 Sep 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL DEYOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEYOUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Feb 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1984 |