skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 19:51:33 PM

Gaal, Judit Margit

CPSO#: 30039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Judit M. Gaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

RSRS Inc.
111 St. Regis Cr. S
North York  ON  M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019


Instructions/Address:

Patients may contact above.
404 - 220 Dundas St W
Whitby, ON  L1N 8M7
Tel:  905-668-5300
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019