THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:19:37 PM
McKenzie, Stephen Wayne
CPSO#:
30023
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
18 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Jul-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stephen W. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 23 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 18 Jul 2022 |