skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 6:59:28 AM

Sivers, David Robert

CPSO#: 30021

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dave Sivers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Dr. Siver's medical records are being stored with Ontario Document Services. They can reached at 1-877-560-4637 or email address: [email protected]
Date Received: 30 Oct 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022