skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/07/20 1:48:16 AM

Greenspoon, Allen Sheldon

CPSO#: 29969

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
M1-414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: (905) 546-0361 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenspoon ( CPSO# 29969 )

Business Address:
Suite M-1
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 529-5221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLEN SHELDON GREENSPOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPOON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018