skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 17:17:53 PM

Knapp, Harvey Kelly

CPSO#: 29964

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Dec 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Enahnced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON M8W 0A2
Date Received: 30 Nov 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harvey Kelly Knapp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 22, 2021:

Dr. Knapp resigned from the College effective December 1, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)