THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:59:21 AM
Zuckerman, Hanna Eleanor
CPSO#:
29890
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hanna Zuckerman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Karen Weisz,
701- 240 Duncan MIll Rd.
Toronto, ON M3B 3S6
TEL: 416-229-6300 FAX: 416-229-6283
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |