THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:41:17 AM
Krupa, Norman Kenneth
CPSO#:
29882
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Norman Krupa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Storage & Retrieval Services
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 13 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Mar 2017 |