THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:29:27 PM
Brunet, Donald George
CPSO#:
29849
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Apr 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Donald Brunet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1.
Paitent Records Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
2.
Martins Data Management
95 Terryfox Dr
Kingston ON K7M 8N4
Tel: (613) 542-4510
Date Received: 27 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:27 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2018 |