THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:34:08 PM
McConnell, Harriet Dianne
CPSO#:
29814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic for Person-Centred
Psychotherapy
Unit A201
2040 Sheppard Ave.E,
North York ON M2J 5B3
Phone: (416) 229-2399 Ext. 282
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARRIET DIANNE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Feb 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1985 |