THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:24:07 AM
Chow, Raphael Kian Thong
CPSO#:
29800
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:02 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAPHAEL KIAN THONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1978 |