THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:34:46 PM
Atherton, William
CPSO#:
29782
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Atherton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Feb 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2014 |