THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:17:37 AM
Keith, Brian Reginald
CPSO#:
29718
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
01 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Oct 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1989 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry |
Effective: 10 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2001 |