THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:44:07 AM
Zavery, Oanali Taherali
CPSO#:
29588
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: O. Zavery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
MyHealth/ Cardiolgy /Outlook
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V4M8
1-705 201 5425
Date Received: 29 Dec 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2020 |