skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 11:12:20 AM

Gionet, Larry Roger

CPSO#: 29569

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Larry Gionet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Merivale Medical Imaging 1370 Clyde Ave Nepean, ON K2G 3H8 Phone: 613-727-1072
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018