THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:05:23 AM
Murphy, Timothy Francis
CPSO#:
29564
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 May 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Feb 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2000 |