skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 13:53:03 PM

McIsaac, Joseph Hugh

CPSO#: 29482

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 116
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 236-8182
Fax: (613) 236-8154 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Hugh McIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 19 Oct 2021 Active
 As from October 19, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Hugh McIsaac in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. McIsaac to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:



UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. JOSEPH HUGH McISAAC
("Dr. McIsaac")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. McIsaac, certificate of registration number 29482, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that following a peer assessment that raised concerns about my family medicine practice, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice.  The reassessment report subsequently received by the College in File Number CAS-07996-D1L1C8 raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for a minimum of six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months;

(iv)	After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months;

(v)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(vi)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vii)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(viii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(ix)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor dated July 5, 2021 and August 5, 2021, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, 
obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(6)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Antimicrobial stewardship in primary care course (University of Waterloo): https://uwaterloo.ca/pharmacy/degrees-and-professional-development/distance-education-continuing-professional-development/antimicrobial-stewardship-primary-care-continuing-education;

(ii)	Review, reflection, and discussion of the following resources with my Clinical Supervisor:        
    
1.	The Practice Guide, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Practice-Guide;

2.	Prescribing Drugs, CPSO: https://www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Prescribing-Drugs;

3.	Busse JW, et al. Guideline for opioid therapy and chronic noncancer pain. CMAJ 2017;189(18):E659-E666. https://doi.org/10.1503/cmaj.170363;

4.	Canadian Coalition for Seniors' Mental Health. Canadian guidelines on benzodiazepine receptor agonist use disorder among older adults (2019). https://ccsmh.ca/wp-content/uploads/2019/11/Benzodiazepine_Receptor_Agonist_Use_Disorder_ENG.pdf;

5.	Medical Records Documentation, CPSO: https://www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records-Documentation; and

6.	Self-Guided Chart Review, CPSO resource; 

(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of the date I sign this Undertaking or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(7)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(8)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. McIsaac, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D", respectively. 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(11)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A peer assessment raised concerns about Dr. McIsaac's family medicine practice.  As a result, Dr. McIsaac underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice.  The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine.

Dr. McIsaac will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months. 

Dr. McIsaac will engage in professional education in recordkeeping and with respect to certain clinical issues.

Dr. McIsaac's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

(c)	I, Dr. McIsaac, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. McIsaac, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 19, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Hugh McIsaac to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2021:

A peer assessment raised concerns about Dr. McIsaac’s family medicine practice. As a result, Dr. McIsaac underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine.

Dr. McIsaac will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months.

Dr. McIsaac will engage in professional education in recordkeeping and with respect to certain clinical issues.

Dr. McIsaac’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.