skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 9:24:16 AM

Rouf, Rehana Khatun

CPSO#: 29467

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Oct 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rehana Rouf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 
The Medical Records Department
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville, Ontario
N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 2021